Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST LAURENCE

Charity number: 1165174
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £162.70k £202.24k £207.04k £198.79k £227.59k
Total expenditure £189.01k £194.18k £182.23k £155.47k £201.90k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A