Trustees Embracing Arts

Charity number: 1162812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Bar Huberman Chair 08 February 2021
None on record
Elaine King Trustee 30 June 2022
None on record
Andrew Keogan Trustee 16 May 2022
None on record
Samson Oluwatobi Ajewole Ayinde Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
Matthew Jack Anthony Charlton Trustee 23 March 2021
None on record
Christopher Pizzey BA Hons Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
Dave Hearn BA Hons Trustee 04 July 2018
None on record
EMMA JANE REEVES Trustee 23 July 2015
None on record