Financial history 360 GIVING

Charity number: 1164883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £448.39k £515.98k £500.28k £587.96k £518.90k
Total expenditure £486.25k £460.56k £476.97k £508.39k £606.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £347.75k £295.00k £355.00k £350.00k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £168.23k £205.28k £232.96k £168.85k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £54
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £460.56k £476.97k £508.39k £606.45k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £32.41k £15.21k £16.88k £20.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0