Accounts and annual returns GROWING AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1163738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 30 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 17 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 17 July 2017 On time Download Open in new window