Trustees GROWING AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1163738
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALLEN BARRY DAVIS BA HONS Chair 28 September 2015
None on record
Jonathan Roddick Trustee 02 January 2020
None on record
Mike Francis Howes Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
Maire Cleary Trustee 12 December 2017
None on record
Christopher John Heawood Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
Edward Brown QC Trustee 07 January 2016
None on record
Dr SIMON HARDING Trustee 29 July 2015
None on record
Dr DUNCAN BEW Trustee 09 September 2014
None on record