Accounts and annual returns THE FLORENCE KLEINER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1163782
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 02 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 November 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 03 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window