CENTRE FOR THE ACCELERATION OF SOCIAL TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 1161998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £620.31k £1.14m £1.16m £2.14m £6.27m
Total expenditure £613.26k £839.89k £1.09m £1.80m £5.79m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £622.18k £977.82k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £496.82k £940.21k £200.00k £200.00k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £123.49k £200.11k £960.54k £1.94m £6.27m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £481.46k £820.59k £1.07m £1.78m £5.77m
Expenditure - Raising funds £22.87k £19.30k £20.89k £22.59k £29.02k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.13k £5.01k £5.56k £31.67k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £261.53k £232.16k £1.76m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £108.93k £0 £0 £0 £0