CENTRE FOR THE ACCELERATION OF SOCIAL TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 1161998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY MCKENNA Trustee 06 January 2015
SOCIAL CARE INSTITUTE FOR EXCELLENCE Received: On time
Professor Kerensa Jane Jennings Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Gaia-Ines Fasso Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Kathryn Alison Collins Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Lord James Philip Knight Chair 01 October 2016 None on record
Lara Burns Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Prue Quarcoo Trustee 01 March 2021 None on record
Pema Jane Radha Trustee 25 November 2020 None on record
Ms Emma Thomas Trustee 01 May 2015
CHRISTOPHER AND ELSPETH THOMAS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time