CENTRE FOR THE ACCELERATION OF SOCIAL TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 1161998
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 22 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 26 February 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 27 March 2018 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 27 March 2018 27 days late Download