Accounts and annual returns MUSIC IN OUR BONES

Charity number: 1166578
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 November 2020 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

18 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window