FARNDON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1163372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 January 2020 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 14 January 2020 75 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 October 2017 On time Download