FARNDON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1163372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Robert David Gresty Trustee 07 June 2017 None on record
KATHERINE HILARY WILLIAMS Trustee 02 September 2015 None on record
Huw Christopher Morris Trustee 01 January 2019 None on record
Robert John Caddy Chair 01 January 2019 None on record
JOHN HILLYER Trustee 18 May 2016 None on record
Deborah Molony Trustee 19 July 2021 None on record
Gillian Nove Trustee 19 July 2021 None on record
Linda Maria Twydell Trustee 01 December 2016 None on record