FARNDON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1163372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £75.18k £89.76k £48.60k £48.71k £34.94k
Total expenditure £61.62k £71.36k £47.41k £44.51k £36.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £8.00k £9.84k N/A N/A £12.37k