HARBOROUGH TOWN COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1163188
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 23 June 2021 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 23 June 2021 84 days late Download
Annual return 31 May 2019 28 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 28 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 28 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2017 16 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 16 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 May 2016 01 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 01 March 2017 On time Download