1ST ALL SAINTS SHERBURN-IN-ELMET SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 506529
Charity reporting is up to date (9 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 05 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 05 August 2019 186 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 915 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 May 2018 109 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required