Trustees HILLINGDON BRAIN TUMOUR & BRAIN INJURY GROUP

Charity number: 1164538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emmanual Daudu Chair 23 September 2021
None on record
Mairead Jennings Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Amisha Thobhani Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Dr Michael Simons Trustee 01 December 2019
None on record
Mary O'Connor Trustee 06 December 2018
None on record
Abhay Shah Trustee 01 February 2016
None on record