Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES NEWCHAPEL

Charity number: 1163088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

19 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window