Financial history ROYAL SUTTON COLDFIELD COMMUNITY TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1165712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £16.10k £115.00k £861.47k £620.48k £357.30k
Total expenditure £10.24k £136.50k £509.09k £578.95k £297.98k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £389.60k N/A £191.39k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £447.78k £173.75k N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £413.69k £446.71k N/A
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £18 N/A
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £509.09k £578.95k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £2.57k £6.59k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A