ROYAL SUTTON COLDFIELD COMMUNITY TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1165712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 29 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 29 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 25 April 2019 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 25 April 2019 56 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 12 December 2017 On time Download