ROYAL SUTTON COLDFIELD COMMUNITY TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1165712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosemary Walton Trustee 01 July 2019 None on record
Janet Cairnes Trustee 10 July 2018
SUTTON COLDFIELD DISABILITY ACTION GROUP Received: On time
Richard Howard Mason Chair 01 October 2016
THE SUTTON COLDFIELD CHORAL SOCIETY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL, WYLDE GREEN Received: On time
David Pears Trustee 13 November 2018 None on record
Claire Bridges Trustee 15 January 2017 None on record
Ewan Forbes Mackey Trustee 15 May 2018
B:MUSIC LTD Received: On time
Russell Steele Ludlam Trustee 05 June 2017 None on record