Trustees FAMILIES AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1166240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES GREGORY Chair 01 July 2016
None on record
Linford Sweeney Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
Will Forwood Trustee 04 April 2022
None on record
Alexandra Dixon Trustee 18 August 2021
None on record
Ahmed yassin Trustee 14 February 2020
None on record
Katie Fattori Fraser Trustee 20 December 2019
None on record