Accounts and annual returns FAMILIES AGAINST VIOLENCE

Charity number: 1166240
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 08 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 April 2021 65 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 06 April 2021 431 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 06 April 2021 431 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 February 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 11 February 2019 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window