HEPWORTH UNITED FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1163904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 18 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 18 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 01 May 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 01 May 2020 1 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 24 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 24 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 05 April 2018 340 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 05 April 2018 340 days late Download