Financial history WORCESTER MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (CIO)

Charity number: 1166931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £1.52m £1.22m £1.24m £1.84m £1.49m
Total expenditure £936.50k £821.08k £988.52k £1.07m £1.33m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A £155.58k
Income from government grants £563.73k £81.75k £149.26k £866.67k £250.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £563.96k £138.60k £103 £0 £405.68k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £34.68k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £314.83k £358.55k £405.73k £1.30m £954.32k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £628.58k £652.01k £589.83k £535.68k £4.33k
Income - Other £7.80k £34.28k £246.58k £11.74k £124.12k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £749.52k £634.24k £946.82k £888.52k £1.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £186.97k £186.84k £41.70k £180.36k £0
Expenditure - Governance £241.30k £12.15k £11.83k £6.31k £6.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £274.66k £299.51k £317.02k £333.00k £332.56k
Expenditure - Investment management £186.97k £0 £41.70k £180.36k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0