Financial history SUPPORT FOR SURVIVORS

Charity number: 1165986
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £3.08k £14.58k £13.77k £23.55k £20.03k
Total expenditure £1.85k £10.30k £12.93k £20.95k £16.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £600 £1.42k £8.00k £18.73k