Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE BENEFICE OF ST STEPHEN'S, GATEACRE

Charity number: 1164672
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV PHIL JANVIER Chair 25 April 2018
LIVERPOOL CITY CENTRE STREET PASTORS
Overdue by 363 days
CHARITY OF MARY JANE CROSS
Received: On time
Lori Coates Trustee 24 May 2021
YAPPY EVER AFTER DOG RESCUE
Received: On time
Hazel Frear Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Scott Robert Pughsley Trustee 24 May 2021
None on record
Samantha Swan Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Adeyinka Olushonde Trustee 28 October 2020
None on record
Rev Canon Katherine Anne Canty Trustee 01 April 2020
None on record
William Patrick Jnr Snow Trustee 09 November 2019
None on record
Rev Sandra Patricia Doore Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record
Susan Brenda Snow Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Jasmine Lee Preston Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Alastair Bruce Johnston Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Hilary Margaret Morgan Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
LEEANNE Seal Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
KAY MARGARET LYONS Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
CATHERINE MARY JOHNSTON Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record
JOY JARY Trustee 25 April 2018
None on record