Trustees COASTLANDS LOCAL HISTORY GROUP (CIO)

Charity number: 1164339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
YVONNE CLARE EVANS Chair 16 March 2016
WOMEN'S INSTITUTE DALE
Received: On time
Philip Marshall Trustee 23 March 2022
None on record
Peter David Royle Trustee 07 April 2021
None on record
Stephen Morrell Trustee 25 March 2018
None on record
PHILLIP HENRY EDWARDS Trustee 03 April 2017
None on record
HARRIET CHARLOTTE BISHOP Trustee 16 March 2016
CORONATION HALL, DALE (CIO)
Received: On time
MILDRED MARGARET REYNOLDS Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
MRS ANN BARKWORTH Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
MRS MARY LEWIS Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
MRS IRA HEMIGWAY Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record
HILARY JEAN ORTON Trustee 16 March 2016
None on record