Financial history PETT LEVEL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1164637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £10.05k £7.15k £5.04k £8.41k £14.18k
Total expenditure £1.38k £7.56k £6.84k £4.46k £7.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A