Trustees PETT LEVEL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1164637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN NEWTON Chair 10 October 2012
None on record
Joanna Felton Trustee 11 March 2022
None on record
Susan Jayne Harris Trustee 13 January 2022
None on record
Katrina Elizabeth Julian Trustee 11 March 2021
None on record
Theresa Margaret Noutch Trustee 22 June 2020
None on record
Christopher Paul Jordan Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Keith Swallow Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Alexandra Margaret DUTHIE Trustee 18 March 2016
None on record
CLIFFORD DEAN Trustee 10 October 2012
None on record
MARTIN WAKLEY KING Trustee
None on record