Financial history PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PENDLETON & CLAREMONT

Charity number: 1165386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £201.74k £183.41k £130.90k £89.74k £119.26k
Total expenditure £203.48k £188.71k £152.84k £94.20k £125.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £42.38k £0 N/A N/A N/A