Trustees PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL FOR THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF PENDLETON & CLAREMONT

Charity number: 1165386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev DANIEL JOHN A BURTON Chair 13 May 2014
None on record
Henry Kenechukwu Madubuile Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
Karen Schofield Trustee 28 April 2019
None on record
Maria Tessa Jorysz Trustee 13 November 2018
None on record
Michael Marland Trustee 28 April 2018
None on record
Dr ARABELLA HAMILTON MD Trustee 02 June 2017
None on record
CHRISTINE TABBRON Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
HILARY THOMAS Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
Emma Jane Turton Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
KATHLEEN LILIAN ROBERTS Trustee 16 November 2014
None on record
LEE CRAVEN MBE Trustee 16 November 2014
None on record
CHRISTINA YATES Trustee 13 November 2014
None on record
ROWENA ANNE PLATT Trustee 13 November 2014
None on record
JOAN HOWARD Trustee 16 May 2014
ST AMBROSE YOUNG FAMILIES PROJECT
Received: On time
ANNE ROBINSON Trustee 16 May 2014
None on record
IRENE BOOTH Trustee 16 May 2014
None on record
Arnold Allcock Trustee 16 May 2014
None on record
JOHN MCKENNA Trustee 16 May 2014
None on record
AUDREY ALLCOCK Trustee 13 May 2014
None on record