ALDERHOLT COMMUNITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1167313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 07 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 15 June 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 15 June 2017 Not Required