ALDERHOLT COMMUNITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1167313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Caroline Morris Trustee 04 January 2021 None on record
Alison Mary Routley Trustee 04 January 2019 None on record
NORMAN JONES Trustee 14 December 2015 None on record
Zoe Martin Trustee 04 January 2021 None on record
Joanna Emily Anderson Trustee 23 October 2018 None on record
Marcus Trinick Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
Eleanor Morgan Chair 04 January 2021 None on record
Adrian Peter King Trustee 04 January 2021 None on record