Financial history ST. MARGARET'S AT CLIFFE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1166921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £155.82k £81.08k £65.54k £61.69k £55.86k
Total expenditure £86.27k £58.67k £80.14k £67.05k £106.12k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A