Trustees ST. MARGARET'S AT CLIFFE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL

Charity number: 1166921
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Karen Susan Reeves Chair 17 March 2021
THE F E CLEARY FOUR CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
THE CURFEW LAND (OTHERWISE THE PARISH CLERK'S LAND)
Received: On time
James Norman Archer Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Allan Frederick Greenwood Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Elaine Frances Kingston Trustee 02 November 2021
None on record
Linda Ann Carter Trustee 18 March 2018
THE F E CLEARY ST MARGARET-AT-CLIFFE CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE CURFEW LAND (OTHERWISE THE PARISH CLERK'S LAND)
Received: On time
Vivienne Verren Trustee 04 May 2016
THE F E CLEARY FOUR CHURCHES TRUST
Received: On time
THE F E CLEARY ST MARGARET-AT-CLIFFE CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE DOVER DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
THE CURFEW LAND (OTHERWISE THE PARISH CLERK'S LAND)
Received: On time
PAMELA ANN WILLIAMS Trustee 04 May 2016
THE FRIENDS FOR MENTAL HEALTH (EAST KENT)
Received: On time
ANNA GERTRUDE NEWTON Trustee 04 May 2016
THE F E CLEARY ST MARGARET-AT-CLIFFE CHURCH TRUST
Received: On time
Barbara Anne Mary Wells Trustee 04 May 2016
None on record