FERRYHILL COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1169763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 16 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 21 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 26 September 2018 On time Download