Financial history SOUTH WARWICKSHIRE HOSPITAL BROADCASTING ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 507582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.25k £8.17k £5.15k £3.28k £1.29k
Total expenditure £5.39k £3.07k £3.53k £2.76k £1.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A