BEAULIEU COMMUNITY TRUST (BCT)

Charity number: 1169335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joel Gowen Trustee 19 October 2017 None on record
Emma Jane Carrington Trustee 21 November 2017
FARLEIGH HOSPICE Received: On time
Mark Arrowsmith Trustee 24 March 2020 None on record
Rev DAN PIERCE Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
SUSAN SULLIVAN Chair 24 November 2015 None on record
DAVID KENNETH THOMS Trustee 28 September 2018 None on record
IAN DAVID FULLER Trustee 24 November 2015
SPRINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY,SPRINGFIELD, DIOCESE OF CHELMSFORD Received: On time
MAXINE TALBOT Trustee 16 December 2015
TERLING VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
YVONNE SPENCE Trustee 24 November 2015
SPRINGFIELD UNITED CHARITIES Received: On time
CHELMERS VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
NORTH AVENUE YOUTH CENTRE Received: On time
KIDS INSPIRE Received: On time