BEAULIEU COMMUNITY TRUST (BCT)

Charity number: 1169335
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

02 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 21 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

21 January 2018 On time Download