GREATER MANCHESTER WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 508002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 01 March 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 March 2017 29 days late Download