GREATER MANCHESTER WEST COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 508002
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £117.97k £167.20k £326.45k £118.21k £268.45k
Total expenditure £140.01k £151.77k £244.63k £121.42k £342.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A