Accounts and annual returns WINDSOR FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity number: 1166996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 21 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 01 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 15 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 16 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 14 March 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 24 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window