THE BOUNCING BALL TRUST

Charity number: 1170946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 10 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 01 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 20 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 07 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 28 May 2018 On time Download