Financial history ZENITH YOUTH THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1169585
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/09/2017 07/09/2018 07/09/2019 07/09/2020 07/09/2021
Total gross income £48.42k £62.28k £44.49k £25.95k £19.20k
Total expenditure £34.32k £71.06k £36.66k £23.35k £16.72k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A