Accounts and annual returns ST JOHN SINGERS

Charity number: 1169985
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 08 August 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 08 May 2021 312 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required