Financial history ST JOHN SINGERS

Charity number: 1169985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.94k £11.02k £9.69k £10.43k £1.23k
Total expenditure £9.09k £8.59k £9.65k £9.65k £4.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A