Trustees ST JOHN SINGERS

Charity number: 1169985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Cox Chair 03 November 2008
None on record
Julie Davis Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
Catherine Mary Henderson Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Jane Beaumont Trustee 21 October 2019
None on record
ALICE POND Trustee 04 December 2017
None on record
ROBERT PENDLENTON Trustee 09 November 2015
None on record
WENDY EVERITT Trustee 10 November 2014
None on record
BARNABY WAINWRIGHT Trustee 12 November 2012
None on record