BROADLANDS GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1170398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 24 November 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 09 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 09 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 07 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 January 2018 24 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 24 October 2018 On time Download