Accounts and annual returns SPORT AND ARTS IN THE COMMUNITY (SPARC) SOUTH WEST SHROPSHIRE

Charity number: 1170997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window