Financial history SPORT AND ARTS IN THE COMMUNITY (SPARC) SOUTH WEST SHROPSHIRE

Charity number: 1170997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £83.26k £40.52k £36.80k £44.57k £37.14k
Total expenditure £14.93k £15.13k £11.91k £25.05k £27.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £1.50k £30.00k £15.00k